Tnb chairman
Webb30 sep. 2024 · KUALA LUMPUR: Tenaga Nasional Bhd (TNB) has announced the appointment of Datuk Seri Hasan Arifin as its chairman effective from October 1. Hasan, 68, was deputy Menteri Besar of Pahang (1995-1999) and the current Rompin Member of Parliament. He was appointed chairman of Pengurusan Aset Air Bhd last year. Webb30 sep. 2024 · KUALA LUMPUR, Sept 30 — Tenaga Nasional Bhd (TNB) has appointed former Public Accounts Committee (PAC) chairman, Datuk Seri Hasan Arifin, as its …
Tnb chairman
Did you know?
WebbHe is a former chairman of the board for Tenaga Nasional Berhad (TNB) from 12 April 2004 to 11 March 2024, making him the longest-serving chairman of the company. He also served as the chairman of the boards for Universiti Tenaga Nasional (UNITEN) and its pro-chancellor. He also serves as a director of Kapar Energy Ventures Sdn Bhd from 2004. Webb18 juni 2024 · Based on the information provided by TNB, the former Chairman, Tan Sri Leo Moggie received a total of RM876,790 in the year 2024. Using this as a reference, it’s …
WebbTNB appoints Datuk Abdul Razak Abdul Majid as chairman KUALA LUMPUR, March 23 (Bernama) -- Tenaga Nasional Bhd’s (TNB) board of directors has approved the… Webb30 sep. 2024 · KUALA LUMPUR, Sept 30 — Tenaga Nasional Bhd (TNB) has appointed former Public Accounts Committee (PAC) chairman, Datuk Seri Hasan Arifin, as its chairman effective October 1, 2024, succeeding Datuk Seri Mahdzir Khalid who was appointed Minister of Rural Development with effect from August 30, 2024.
Webb• Chairman of the Board and Board member in several organisations. M&A, DD, fund raising. • 10 years of P&L responsibility of revenues of 2-6 Billion SEK • 10 years of … Webb30 sep. 2024 · PETALING JAYA: Tenaga Nasional Berhad (TNB) has appointed Hasan Arifin as its chairman, with the Rompin MP stepping into his new role tomorrow. He will …
Webbför 2 dagar sedan · TNB chief strategy and ventures officer Megat Jalaluddin Megat Hassan said the initiative with Aeon is expected to continue until 2024. ... Energy sector veteran appointed chairman of TNB.
Webb23 mars 2024 · KUALA LUMPUR (March 23): Datuk Abdul Razak Abdul Majid, who has served Tenaga Nasional Bhd (TNB) for 36 years, has been appointed as the group’s new non-independent non-executive chairman for a … timmax bandencentraleWebb20 juli 2024 · Datuk Seri Tajuddin Abdul Rahman (BN-Pasir Salak), who was appointed as the chairman of Prasarana Malaysia Bhd, considered the accusation as serious and evil. “... the salary of a GLC chairman of between RM40,000 and RM50,000 a month, so the government has to bear RM20 to RM30 million a month or a year... parks around buckingham palaceWebbMarie Söderberg, Professor and Chairperson of the Board; Torbjörn Becker, Director; Johan Eriksson, Professor ; Erika Ferrer, Ambassador; Isabell Schierenbeck, Professor ; Annika … tim maximoffWebb27 mars 2024 · Abdul Razak resigns as Petronas Gas director following appointment as TNB chairman KUALA LUMPUR (March 27): Datuk Abdul Razak Abdul Majid has resigned from Petronas Gas Bhd’s board as an independent non-executive director, effective from Monday (March 27). He joined the group as a director in September 2024. tim maxwell airstreamWebb5 aug. 2024 · Tenaga Nasional Berhad (TNB) is pleased to announce the appointment of Dato’ Seri Mahdzir Khalid as Chairman of TNB effective 12th May 2024. He replaces Tan … parks arlington texasWebb30 sep. 2024 · In a filing with Bursa Malaysia on Thursday, TNB said Hasan, former Pahang deputy menteri besar (1995-1999), is also currently the chairman of Pengurusan Aset Air Bhd. Notably, he was also the chairman of the Public Accounts Committee (PAC) from 2015 to 2024, and was on the board of directors of UDA Holdings Bhd from 2010 to 2015. parks arlington waWebb1 okt. 2024 · Tenaga Nasional Bhd (TNB) has appointed Datuk Seri Hasan Arifin as its chairman effective today to replace Datuk Seri Mahdzir Khalid who was appointed as the Rural Development Minister with effect from Aug 30, 2024. Hasan is a current member of parliament for Rompin and was appointed as chairman of Pengurusan Aset Air Bhd last … parks arlington tx